THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:39:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 676 Taunton Rd. E.
Whitby ON L1R 0K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-266-3036
Fax: 855-953-3537
Address: 47 Liberty St S
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Department of Emergency Medicine
Bowmanville ON L1C 2N4
Phone: 905-623-3331
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Larocque Medicine Profressional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Larocque (CPSO#: 112304 )
Business Address: 1731 Rockwood Drive
Pickering Ontario L1V 6R3

Corporation Name: Michael Larocque Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 May 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 676 Taunton Rd. E.
Whitby ON L1R 0K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-266-3036
Fax: 855-953-3537
Address: 47 Liberty St S
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Department of Emergency Medicine
Bowmanville ON L1C 2N4
Phone: 905-623-3331
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Larocque Medicine Profressional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Larocque (CPSO#: 112304 )
Business Address: 1731 Rockwood Drive
Pickering Ontario L1V 6R3

Corporation Name: Michael Larocque Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 May 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL LAROCQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAROCQUE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL LAROCQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAROCQUE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017