THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 07:42:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 119 Memorial Ave
Suite 201A
Orillia ON L3V 5X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-325-0630
Fax: 705-325-9498

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jul 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 26 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Duquette Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Duquette (CPSO#: 112307 )
Business Address: 201-119 Memorial Ave
Orillia ON L3V 5X1
7053250630

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 119 Memorial Ave
Suite 201A
Orillia ON L3V 5X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-325-0630
Fax: 705-325-9498

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jul 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 26 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Duquette Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Duquette (CPSO#: 112307 )
Business Address: 201-119 Memorial Ave
Orillia ON L3V 5X1
7053250630

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE CYNTHIA DUQUETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUQUETTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE CYNTHIA DUQUETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUQUETTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017