THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:31:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054942120
Extension: 57337
Fax: 9054946563

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. REBECCA JEFFERY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jeffery (CPSO#: 112317 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054942120
Extension: 57337
Fax: 9054946563

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. REBECCA JEFFERY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jeffery (CPSO#: 112317 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA ANGELA JEFFERY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEFFERY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA ANGELA JEFFERY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEFFERY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017