THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:50:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Centenary Hospital
Department of Medicine
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 25 Morton Shulman Ave
Office of the Chief Coroner
North York ON M3M 0B1
Phone: 416-314-4000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Sidalak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sidalak (CPSO#: 112337 )
Business Address: 25 Morton Shulman Ave
Office of the Chief Coroner
Toronto Region
North York ON M3M 0B1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Centenary Hospital
Department of Medicine
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 25 Morton Shulman Ave
Office of the Chief Coroner
North York ON M3M 0B1
Phone: 416-314-4000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Sidalak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sidalak (CPSO#: 112337 )
Business Address: 25 Morton Shulman Ave
Office of the Chief Coroner
Toronto Region
North York ON M3M 0B1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL EDWIN SIDALAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDALAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL EDWIN SIDALAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDALAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017