THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:26:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: Afagh, Melody Shireen (Used Until: 01 Aug 2023)
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137212000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MELODY SHIREEN ROBERTS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Roberts (CPSO#: 112350 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital - Department of Anesthesiology
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
613-720-2000

General Information

Former Name: Afagh, Melody Shireen (Used Until: 01 Aug 2023)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137212000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MELODY SHIREEN ROBERTS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Roberts (CPSO#: 112350 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital - Department of Anesthesiology
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
613-720-2000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELODY SHIREEN ROBERTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELODY SHIREEN ROBERTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017