THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:27:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058452571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Area Hospital
Mental Health and Addictions
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: 7057593434
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 145 Front St E
Inner City Health Associates
Toronto ON M5A 1E3
Phone: 4165914411
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 03 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth Lovell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lovell (CPSO#: 112353 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Address: 145 Front St E
Toronto ON M5A 1E3
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0A8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058452571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Area Hospital
Mental Health and Addictions
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: 7057593434
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 145 Front St E
Inner City Health Associates
Toronto ON M5A 1E3
Phone: 4165914411
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 03 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth Lovell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lovell (CPSO#: 112353 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Address: 145 Front St E
Toronto ON M5A 1E3
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0A8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANNE LOVELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOVELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANNE LOVELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOVELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017