THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:38:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 604 Main Street South
Airdrie Community Health Centre
Urgent Care
Airdrie Alberta T4B 3K7
Phone: 4039128511
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 02 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 02 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 28 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kai Yang Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Yang (CPSO#: 112368 )
Business Address: 27 William Logan Drive
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 1A2
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Address:

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 604 Main Street South
Airdrie Community Health Centre
Urgent Care
Airdrie Alberta T4B 3K7
Phone: 4039128511
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 02 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 02 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 28 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kai Yang Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Yang (CPSO#: 112368 )
Business Address: 27 William Logan Drive
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 1A2
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Address:

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAI YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAI YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Feb 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2017