THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:12:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 College Dr
North Bay ON P1B 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 474 8600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 03 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. DOLP MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dolp (CPSO#: 112377 )
Business Address: 50 College Dr
North Bay ON P1B 0A4
705-474-8600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 College Dr
North Bay ON P1B 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 474 8600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 03 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. DOLP MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dolp (CPSO#: 112377 )
Business Address: 50 College Dr
North Bay ON P1B 0A4
705-474-8600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REINHARD DOLP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOLP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REINHARD DOLP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOLP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017