THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:37:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 23 Huron St W
South Huron Medical Clinic
Family Medicine
Clinic
Exeter ON N0M 1S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192353343
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 24 Huron St W
South Huron Hospital
Emergency Department
Exeter ON N0M 1S2
Phone: 5192352700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michaela Ondrejicka Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ondrejicka (CPSO#: 112412 )
Business Address: 24 Huron Street West
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S2
Business Address: 23 Huron Street West
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 23 Huron St W
South Huron Medical Clinic
Family Medicine
Clinic
Exeter ON N0M 1S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192353343
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 24 Huron St W
South Huron Hospital
Emergency Department
Exeter ON N0M 1S2
Phone: 5192352700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michaela Ondrejicka Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ondrejicka (CPSO#: 112412 )
Business Address: 24 Huron Street West
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S2
Business Address: 23 Huron Street West
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAELA STEPHANIE ONDREJICKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ONDREJICKA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAELA STEPHANIE ONDREJICKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ONDREJICKA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017