THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:21:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queens Family Health Team
Department of Family Medicine
115 Clarence Street
3rd Floor Haynes Hall
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 533-9300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. GOLDEN GAO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Gao (CPSO#: 112439 )
Business Address: 115 Clarence St
Kingston ON K7L 5N6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queens Family Health Team
Department of Family Medicine
115 Clarence Street
3rd Floor Haynes Hall
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 533-9300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. GOLDEN GAO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Gao (CPSO#: 112439 )
Business Address: 115 Clarence St
Kingston ON K7L 5N6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GOLDEN GAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GOLDEN GAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017