THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:18:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mountdale Clinic
620 Arthur St W
Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 5R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8075775676
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JEREMY COLE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cole (CPSO#: 112487 )
Business Address: 620 Arthur Street West
103
Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 5R8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mountdale Clinic
620 Arthur St W
Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 5R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8075775676
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JEREMY COLE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cole (CPSO#: 112487 )
Business Address: 620 Arthur Street West
103
Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 5R8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEREMY RYAN WILLIAM COLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEREMY RYAN WILLIAM COLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017