THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:34:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110 Victoria Ave
La Verendrye Hospital
Fort Frances ON P9A 2B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 274-3261
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Mar 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
HOSPITAL: La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carolyn Trottier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Trottier (CPSO#: 112499 )
Business Address: 110 Victoria Ave
Fort Frances ON P9A 2B7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110 Victoria Ave
La Verendrye Hospital
Fort Frances ON P9A 2B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 274-3261
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Mar 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
HOSPITAL: La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carolyn Trottier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Trottier (CPSO#: 112499 )
Business Address: 110 Victoria Ave
Fort Frances ON P9A 2B7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLYN EDITH TROTTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TROTTIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLYN EDITH TROTTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TROTTIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017