THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:07:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Geneva, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
Department of Medicine
3rd Floor Room 3464
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-323-7546
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 01 Jul 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vincent Piguet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Piguet (CPSO#: 112530 )
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
Department of Medicine
3rd Floor Room 3464
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-6400 Extn: 5825

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Geneva, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
Department of Medicine
3rd Floor Room 3464
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-323-7546
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 01 Jul 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vincent Piguet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Piguet (CPSO#: 112530 )
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
Department of Medicine
3rd Floor Room 3464
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-6400 Extn: 5825

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
26 May 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 26 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Vincent Albert Piguet may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Dermatology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Piguet
holds an academic appointment at the rank of Full Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Piguet no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Vincent Albert Piguet may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Dermatology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Piguet
holds an academic appointment at the rank of Full Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Piguet no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Geneva, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 26 May 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 26 May 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017