THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:30:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1440 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5R 3J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 654-5437
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: YASMIN KAZEMI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Kazemi (CPSO#: 112538 )
Business Address: 1440 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5R 3J3
4166545437

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1440 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5R 3J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 654-5437
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: YASMIN KAZEMI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Kazemi (CPSO#: 112538 )
Business Address: 1440 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5R 3J3
4166545437

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YASMIN ELIZABETH KAZEMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAZEMI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YASMIN ELIZABETH KAZEMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAZEMI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017