THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:34:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 24 May 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 24 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 24 May 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 24 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL ETHAN AXELROD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AXELROD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL ETHAN AXELROD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AXELROD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Apr 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 18 Apr 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017