THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:30:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 375 Brant St
unit 1
Burlington ON L7R 2E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 592 3007
Fax: 888 972 3907

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sidra Hasnain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Sep 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hasnain (CPSO#: 112553 )
Business Address: 375 Brant St
Unit 1
Burlington ON L7R 2E9
+1 905 592 3007

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 375 Brant St
unit 1
Burlington ON L7R 2E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 592 3007
Fax: 888 972 3907

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sidra Hasnain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Sep 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hasnain (CPSO#: 112553 )
Business Address: 375 Brant St
Unit 1
Burlington ON L7R 2E9
+1 905 592 3007

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIDRA HASNAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASNAIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIDRA HASNAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASNAIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017