THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:28:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: Cmorejova, Jana (Used Until: 20 May 2019)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SLOVAK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4242 Dundas St W
Kingsway Medical Centre
Toronto ON M8X 1Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 341-1321
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3346 Lake Shore Blvd W
Etobicoke ON M8W 1M9
Phone: (647) 352-5533
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 537 Finch Ave W
Forestview Retirement Residence
North York ON M2R 0A8
Phone: (416) 398-4999
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Cmorejova, Jana (Used Until: 20 May 2019)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SLOVAK
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4242 Dundas St W
Kingsway Medical Centre
Toronto ON M8X 1Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 341-1321
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3346 Lake Shore Blvd W
Etobicoke ON M8W 1M9
Phone: (647) 352-5533
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 537 Finch Ave W
Forestview Retirement Residence
North York ON M2R 0A8
Phone: (416) 398-4999
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANA ZELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZELLI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANA ZELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZELLI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017