THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:18:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 721 Front Road South
unit 104
Amherstburg Ontario N9V 2M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2266743712
Fax: 5192538074

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Silvaggio Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Silvaggio (CPSO#: 112586 )
Business Address: 433 Sandwich Street South
Amherstburg Ontario N9V 3K3
(519) 736-2131
Business Address: 721 Front Rd S
unit 104
Amherstburg ON N9V 2M4
2266743712

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 721 Front Road South
unit 104
Amherstburg Ontario N9V 2M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2266743712
Fax: 5192538074

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Silvaggio Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Silvaggio (CPSO#: 112586 )
Business Address: 433 Sandwich Street South
Amherstburg Ontario N9V 3K3
(519) 736-2131
Business Address: 721 Front Rd S
unit 104
Amherstburg ON N9V 2M4
2266743712

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLY MAY SILVAGGIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVAGGIO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLY MAY SILVAGGIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVAGGIO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017