THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:07:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Box 220
6 Alice Street
Flesherton Family Practice
Meaford Thornbury FHO
Flesherton Ontario N0C 1E0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 924-2012
Fax: (519) 924-3828
Address: Markdale Hospital
55 Isla St
Markdale Ontario N0C 1H0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Psychotherapy Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Psychotherapy
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clea Machold Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Machold (CPSO#: 112587 )
Business Address: PO Box 220
6 Alice Street
Flesherton ON N0C 1E0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Box 220
6 Alice Street
Flesherton Family Practice
Meaford Thornbury FHO
Flesherton Ontario N0C 1E0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 924-2012
Fax: (519) 924-3828
Address: Markdale Hospital
55 Isla St
Markdale Ontario N0C 1H0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Psychotherapy Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Psychotherapy
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clea Machold Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Machold (CPSO#: 112587 )
Business Address: PO Box 220
6 Alice Street
Flesherton ON N0C 1E0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLEA ALEXANDRA MACHOLD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACHOLD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLEA ALEXANDRA MACHOLD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACHOLD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Dec 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Dec 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2017