THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:54:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Univ. of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Vennix Integrated Health
6668 3rd line - Building A
Tottenham ON L0G 1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9059364211
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 170 McEwan Dr E
Suite 208
Bolton Ontario L7E4C8
Phone: (905) 857-2356
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 284 Queen St E # 116
Brampton Ontario L6V 1C2
Phone: 9054556464
Fax: 9052641976

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Univ. of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Vennix Integrated Health
6668 3rd line - Building A
Tottenham ON L0G 1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9059364211
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 170 McEwan Dr E
Suite 208
Bolton Ontario L7E4C8
Phone: (905) 857-2356
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 284 Queen St E # 116
Brampton Ontario L6V 1C2
Phone: 9054556464
Fax: 9052641976

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROHAN VEER MANOCHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANOCHA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROHAN VEER MANOCHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANOCHA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Univ. of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017