THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:26:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 90 Royal Landing Gate
Rideau Crossing Family Health Centre
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-258-0100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1980 Ogilvie Rd
LEAF Weight Management Clinic
Gloucester ON K1J 9L3
Phone: 613-701-1222
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leigh WatersMedicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Waters (CPSO#: 112601 )
Business Address: 90 Royal Landing Gate
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
613-258-0100
Business Address: 1980 Ogilvie Rd
Gloucester ON K1J 9L3
613-701-1222
Business Address: 1125 Colonel By Dr
Ottawa ON K1S 5B6
613-520-3510

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 90 Royal Landing Gate
Rideau Crossing Family Health Centre
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-258-0100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1980 Ogilvie Rd
LEAF Weight Management Clinic
Gloucester ON K1J 9L3
Phone: 613-701-1222
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leigh WatersMedicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Waters (CPSO#: 112601 )
Business Address: 90 Royal Landing Gate
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
613-258-0100
Business Address: 1980 Ogilvie Rd
Gloucester ON K1J 9L3
613-701-1222
Business Address: 1125 Colonel By Dr
Ottawa ON K1S 5B6
613-520-3510

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEIGH ELLEN WATERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEIGH ELLEN WATERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017