THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:52:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200-444 Boul De L'hôpital
Gatineau QC J8T 7X6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8196697393
Fax: 8195685400
Address: 909 BOULEVARD LA VERENDRYE
GATINEAU Quebec J8P7H2
Phone: (819)966-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Apr 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wadih B. Azzi Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Azzi (CPSO#: 112609 )
Business Address: 200-444 Boul De L'hôpital
Gatineau QC J8T 7X6
8196697393

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200-444 Boul De L'hôpital
Gatineau QC J8T 7X6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8196697393
Fax: 8195685400
Address: 909 BOULEVARD LA VERENDRYE
GATINEAU Quebec J8P7H2
Phone: (819)966-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Apr 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wadih B. Azzi Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Azzi (CPSO#: 112609 )
Business Address: 200-444 Boul De L'hôpital
Gatineau QC J8T 7X6
8196697393

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WADIH AZZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZZI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WADIH AZZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZZI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2017
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2017