THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:29:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Tremaine Medical
Unit 1-3 6000 Main st West
Milton ON L9T 9M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-429-0370
Fax: 289-429-0371
Address: Milton Urgent Care Clinic
400 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T0H7
Phone: 9058763843
Fax: 9058762486

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Erum Perveen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Perveen (CPSO#: 112618 )
Business Address: 6000 Main street West Unit 1-3
Milton Ontario L9T9M1
2894290370

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Tremaine Medical
Unit 1-3 6000 Main st West
Milton ON L9T 9M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-429-0370
Fax: 289-429-0371
Address: Milton Urgent Care Clinic
400 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T0H7
Phone: 9058763843
Fax: 9058762486

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Erum Perveen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Perveen (CPSO#: 112618 )
Business Address: 6000 Main street West Unit 1-3
Milton Ontario L9T9M1
2894290370

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERUM PERVEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERVEEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERUM PERVEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERVEEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017