THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/05/25 19:32:34 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055768711
Extension: 33200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: VARUNA PRAKASH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Prakash (CPSO#: 112620 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055768711
Extension: 33200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: VARUNA PRAKASH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Prakash (CPSO#: 112620 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VARUNA PRAKASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRAKASH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VARUNA PRAKASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRAKASH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Apr 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017