THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:16:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: Nauth, Shara Nirvani (Used Until: 04 May 2022)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-281-7446
Fax: 416-281-7082

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 28 Apr 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 22 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 28 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shara Fitzgerald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fitzgerald (CPSO#: 112624 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9

General Information

Former Name: Nauth, Shara Nirvani (Used Until: 04 May 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-281-7446
Fax: 416-281-7082

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 28 Apr 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 22 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 28 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shara Fitzgerald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fitzgerald (CPSO#: 112624 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARA NIRVANI FITZGERALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FITZGERALD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARA NIRVANI FITZGERALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FITZGERALD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017