THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:39:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 311
15 Mountain Avenue South
Stoney Creek Ontario L8G 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 662-4911
Fax: (905) 662-1688

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Xin Yin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. X. Yin (CPSO#: 112674 )
Business Address: 311-15 Mountain Ave S
Stoney Creek ON L8G 2V6
9056624911

Corporation Name: Dr. Xin Yin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Mar 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 311
15 Mountain Avenue South
Stoney Creek Ontario L8G 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 662-4911
Fax: (905) 662-1688

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Xin Yin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. X. Yin (CPSO#: 112674 )
Business Address: 311-15 Mountain Ave S
Stoney Creek ON L8G 2V6
9056624911

Corporation Name: Dr. Xin Yin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Mar 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XIN YIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XIN YIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017