THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:33:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: Dunnigan, Samantha Kay (Used Until: 19 Sep 2017)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 306 - 3292 Bayview Ave
North York ON M2M 4J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 225-8499
Fax: (416) 225-1089
Address: 101-3603 Highway 7 E
Markham ON L3R 8W3
Phone: 365-509-2311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North York General Hospital - General Site
4001 Leslie St
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North York General Hospital - Branson Ambulatory Care Centre
555 Finch Ave W
North York ON M2R 1N5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North York General Hospital - After Hours Clinic
2901 Bayview Ave
North York ON M2K 1E6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AVADIEV MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Avadiev (CPSO#: 112680 )
Business Address: 306-3292 Bayview Ave
North York ON M2M 4J5
(416) 225-8499

General Information

Former Name: Dunnigan, Samantha Kay (Used Until: 19 Sep 2017)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 306 - 3292 Bayview Ave
North York ON M2M 4J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 225-8499
Fax: (416) 225-1089
Address: 101-3603 Highway 7 E
Markham ON L3R 8W3
Phone: 365-509-2311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North York General Hospital - General Site
4001 Leslie St
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North York General Hospital - Branson Ambulatory Care Centre
555 Finch Ave W
North York ON M2R 1N5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North York General Hospital - After Hours Clinic
2901 Bayview Ave
North York ON M2K 1E6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AVADIEV MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Avadiev (CPSO#: 112680 )
Business Address: 306-3292 Bayview Ave
North York ON M2M 4J5
(416) 225-8499

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMANTHA KAY AVADIEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AVADIEV is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMANTHA KAY AVADIEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AVADIEV is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017