THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:41:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 194 Talbot Street West
Erie Shores Healthcare
Emergency Department
Leamington Ontario N8H 3X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 322-2501
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2-1468 Front Road
Revery Medical Aesthetics
Windsor Ontario N9J 2B3
Phone: 519-978-9323
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1060-2109 Ottawa St
Windsor ON N8Y 1R8
Phone: 519-254-4154
Fax: 519-254-4158

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 14 Sep 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bryce Leontowicz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Leontowicz (CPSO#: 112684 )
Business Address: 325 Margaret Ave
Wallaceburg ON N8A 2A7
(519) 352-6400
Business Address: 194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON N8H 1N9
(519) 326-2373
Business Address: 33 Princess Street
Leamington ON N8H 5C5
519-997-2828
Business Address: unit 2-1468 Front Road
Windsor Ontario N9J 2B3
5199789323
Business Address: 1060-2109 Ottawa St
Unit 1060
Windsor ON N8Y 1R8
519-254-4154
Business Address: 1100 University Ave W
Windsor ON N9A 5S7
(519) 997-2404

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 194 Talbot Street West
Erie Shores Healthcare
Emergency Department
Leamington Ontario N8H 3X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 322-2501
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2-1468 Front Road
Revery Medical Aesthetics
Windsor Ontario N9J 2B3
Phone: 519-978-9323
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1060-2109 Ottawa St
Windsor ON N8Y 1R8
Phone: 519-254-4154
Fax: 519-254-4158

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 14 Sep 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bryce Leontowicz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Leontowicz (CPSO#: 112684 )
Business Address: 325 Margaret Ave
Wallaceburg ON N8A 2A7
(519) 352-6400
Business Address: 194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON N8H 1N9
(519) 326-2373
Business Address: 33 Princess Street
Leamington ON N8H 5C5
519-997-2828
Business Address: unit 2-1468 Front Road
Windsor Ontario N9J 2B3
5199789323
Business Address: 1060-2109 Ottawa St
Unit 1060
Windsor ON N8Y 1R8
519-254-4154
Business Address: 1100 University Ave W
Windsor ON N9A 5S7
(519) 997-2404

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRYCE JACKSON LEONTOWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONTOWICZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRYCE JACKSON LEONTOWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONTOWICZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017