THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:05:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11 Gibb St
Glazier Medical
Oshawa ON L1H 2J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-579-1212
Extension: 320
Fax: 289-731-2042
Address: 47 Liberty St S
Lakeridge Health
Bowmanville ON L1C 2N4
Phone: 905-623-3331
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 451 Paxton St
Lakeridge Health Port Perry
Port Perry ON L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-7321
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site
LOCATION: Port Perry

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sahaana Rangarajan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rangarajan (CPSO#: 112699 )
Business Address: 11 Gibb St
Oshawa ON L1H 2J9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11 Gibb St
Glazier Medical
Oshawa ON L1H 2J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-579-1212
Extension: 320
Fax: 289-731-2042
Address: 47 Liberty St S
Lakeridge Health
Bowmanville ON L1C 2N4
Phone: 905-623-3331
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 451 Paxton St
Lakeridge Health Port Perry
Port Perry ON L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-7321
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site
LOCATION: Port Perry

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sahaana Rangarajan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rangarajan (CPSO#: 112699 )
Business Address: 11 Gibb St
Oshawa ON L1H 2J9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAHAANA RANGARAJAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANGARAJAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAHAANA RANGARAJAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANGARAJAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017