THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:31:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: Chen, Amy Pin Yu (Used Until: 19 Feb 2021)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301-4800 Leslie St
North York ON M2J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 -628-1312
Fax: 416-628-1227

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 May 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amy Liao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Liao (CPSO#: 112708 )
Business Address: 4001 Leslie St
Department of Family Medicine, Room 630N
North York ON M2K 1E1
Business Address: 301-4800 Leslie St
North York ON M2J 2K9
Business Address: 301-4800 Leslie St
North York ON M2J 2K9

General Information

Former Name: Chen, Amy Pin Yu (Used Until: 19 Feb 2021)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301-4800 Leslie St
North York ON M2J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 -628-1312
Fax: 416-628-1227

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 May 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amy Liao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Liao (CPSO#: 112708 )
Business Address: 4001 Leslie St
Department of Family Medicine, Room 630N
North York ON M2K 1E1
Business Address: 301-4800 Leslie St
North York ON M2J 2K9
Business Address: 301-4800 Leslie St
North York ON M2J 2K9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMY PIN YU LIAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMY PIN YU LIAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 May 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017