THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:09:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 47 Liberty St S
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Bowmanville ON L1C 2N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 623-3331
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Graeme Higgins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Higgins (CPSO#: 112744 )
Business Address: 365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
(519) 426-0130
Business Address: 47 Liberty Street South
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Emergency Department
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 47 Liberty St S
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Bowmanville ON L1C 2N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 623-3331
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Graeme Higgins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Higgins (CPSO#: 112744 )
Business Address: 365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
(519) 426-0130
Business Address: 47 Liberty Street South
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Emergency Department
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRAEME PATRICK HIGGINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIGGINS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRAEME PATRICK HIGGINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIGGINS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017