THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:24:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: Isleam, Olgun Nuri (Used Until: 14 Oct 2018)
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-745 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 0B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197408400
Fax: 5197408440

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 23 Aug 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 23 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: OLGUN AKMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Akman (CPSO#: 112757 )
Business Address: 201-745 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 0B6
5197408400

General Information

Former Name: Isleam, Olgun Nuri (Used Until: 14 Oct 2018)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-745 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 0B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197408400
Fax: 5197408440

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 23 Aug 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 23 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: OLGUN AKMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Akman (CPSO#: 112757 )
Business Address: 201-745 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 0B6
5197408400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLGUN AKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLGUN AKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Oct 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017