THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:05:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-378-4647
Fax: 905-684-6411
Address: 711 Concession Street
Juravinski Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
Room A3-52
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Phone: +19053894411
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MASHRUR RAHMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rahman (CPSO#: 112781 )
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
905-378-4647

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-378-4647
Fax: 905-684-6411
Address: 711 Concession Street
Juravinski Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
Room A3-52
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Phone: +19053894411
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MASHRUR RAHMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rahman (CPSO#: 112781 )
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
905-378-4647

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MASHRUR RAHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MASHRUR RAHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 May 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 May 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 May 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017