THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:16:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1101 Rutherford Rd
Maple ENT Clinic
Unit 1-2
Thornhill ON L4J 0E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 597-1302
Fax: (905) 695-3595

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 07 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Oak Valley Health Markham
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. GORDON B. HUA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Hua (CPSO#: 112783 )
Business Address: 1101 Rutherford Road
Unit 1-2
Vaughan Ontario L4J 0E2
9055971302 Extn: 1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, MANDARIN
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1101 Rutherford Rd
Maple ENT Clinic
Unit 1-2
Thornhill ON L4J 0E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 597-1302
Fax: (905) 695-3595

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 07 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Oak Valley Health Markham
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. GORDON B. HUA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Hua (CPSO#: 112783 )
Business Address: 1101 Rutherford Road
Unit 1-2
Vaughan Ontario L4J 0E2
9055971302 Extn: 1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GORDON BEN HUA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GORDON BEN HUA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 May 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017