THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:42:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2240 Lake Shore Blvd W
Etobicoke ON M8V 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site Chesley
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site
LOCATION: Chesley

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tabitha Olivia Tonsaker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tonsaker (CPSO#: 112805 )
Business Address: 2240 Lakeshore Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M6K 3R1
(416) 800-6500
Business Address: 33 Second Street
Chesley Ontario N0G 1L0
(519) 363-3220
Business Address: 3471 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Etobicoke Ontario M8W 1N2
(519) 363-3220

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2240 Lake Shore Blvd W
Etobicoke ON M8V 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site Chesley
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site
LOCATION: Chesley

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tabitha Olivia Tonsaker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tonsaker (CPSO#: 112805 )
Business Address: 2240 Lakeshore Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M6K 3R1
(416) 800-6500
Business Address: 33 Second Street
Chesley Ontario N0G 1L0
(519) 363-3220
Business Address: 3471 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Etobicoke Ontario M8W 1N2
(519) 363-3220

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TABITHA OLIVIA TONSAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TONSAKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TABITHA OLIVIA TONSAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TONSAKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017