THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:23:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
St. Joeseph's Hospital Hand & Upper Limb Clinic
Division of Plastic & Reconstructive Surgery
London Ontario N6A 5C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Spencer Chambers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chambers (CPSO#: 112833 )
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
McFarlane Hand & Upper Limb Centre - St. Joseph's Hospital
Room D0-201
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
University Hospital
London Ontario N6G 2M3
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
Victoria Hospital
London Ontario N6A 5W9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
St. Joeseph's Hospital Hand & Upper Limb Clinic
Division of Plastic & Reconstructive Surgery
London Ontario N6A 5C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Spencer Chambers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chambers (CPSO#: 112833 )
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
McFarlane Hand & Upper Limb Centre - St. Joseph's Hospital
Room D0-201
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
University Hospital
London Ontario N6G 2M3
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
Victoria Hospital
London Ontario N6A 5W9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SPENCER BRIAN CHAMBERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMBERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SPENCER BRIAN CHAMBERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMBERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017