THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:29:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Department of Anesthesia
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 596 Davis Dr
Southlake regional healthre centre
Anesthesia
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: 905-895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Crt
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: (613) 696-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Larkin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Larkin (CPSO#: 112835 )
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Southlake Regional Health CEntre
Department of Anesthesia
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A2
9055768711

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Department of Anesthesia
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 596 Davis Dr
Southlake regional healthre centre
Anesthesia
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: 905-895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Crt
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: (613) 696-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Larkin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Larkin (CPSO#: 112835 )
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Southlake Regional Health CEntre
Department of Anesthesia
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A2
9055768711

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN PAUL ROLAND LARKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LARKIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN PAUL ROLAND LARKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LARKIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Nov 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017