THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:27:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Western University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
Victoria Hospital
Division of emergency medicine
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Petrease Patton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Patton (CPSO#: 112836 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
Emergency Department
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6G 2M3
Business Address: 167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 3Y9
Business Address: 1824 Concession Drive
Newbury Ontario N0L 1Z0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Western University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
Victoria Hospital
Division of emergency medicine
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Petrease Patton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Patton (CPSO#: 112836 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
Emergency Department
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6G 2M3
Business Address: 167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 3Y9
Business Address: 1824 Concession Drive
Newbury Ontario N0L 1Z0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETREASE HELENE PATTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETREASE HELENE PATTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Western University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 May 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 May 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 May 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 May 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 May 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017