THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:52:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-254-5577
Extension: 33665
Fax: 519-255-2285

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michal Krawczyk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Krawczyk (CPSO#: 112866 )
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N9A 1E1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-254-5577
Extension: 33665
Fax: 519-255-2285

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michal Krawczyk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Krawczyk (CPSO#: 112866 )
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N9A 1E1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAL KRAWCZYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAWCZYK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAL KRAWCZYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAWCZYK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017