THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:18:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Four Counties Family Health Team
253A Main St
Glencoe Ontario N0L 1M0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 287-2616
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1824 Concession Drive
Newbury Ontario N0L1Z0
Phone: 519-693-4441
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monica Faria-Crowder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Faria-Crowder (CPSO#: 112870 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Four Counties Family Health Team
253A Main St
Glencoe Ontario N0L 1M0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 287-2616
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1824 Concession Drive
Newbury Ontario N0L1Z0
Phone: 519-693-4441
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monica Faria-Crowder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Faria-Crowder (CPSO#: 112870 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONICA MARTINS PEREIRA FARIA-CROWDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARIA-CROWDER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONICA MARTINS PEREIRA FARIA-CROWDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARIA-CROWDER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017