THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:01:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 580 Harwood Avenue South
Lakeridge Health Ajax Pickering Hospital
Emergency Department
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 25 York St
floor 29
Toronto ON M5J 2V5
Phone: 1-855-577-8838
Fax: 416-572-8699

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Basrin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Basrin (CPSO#: 112871 )
Business Address: 1007-91 Rylander Blvd
(mailbox 452)
Scarborough ON M1B 5M5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 580 Harwood Avenue South
Lakeridge Health Ajax Pickering Hospital
Emergency Department
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 25 York St
floor 29
Toronto ON M5J 2V5
Phone: 1-855-577-8838
Fax: 416-572-8699

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Basrin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Basrin (CPSO#: 112871 )
Business Address: 1007-91 Rylander Blvd
(mailbox 452)
Scarborough ON M1B 5M5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TANZILA BASRIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASRIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TANZILA BASRIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASRIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017