THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:35:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
Division of Hematology
Room E6-211
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 519-685-8718
Fax: 519-685-8294

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 21 Nov 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BH CHIN-YEE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chin-Yee (CPSO#: 112872 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
519-685-8500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
Division of Hematology
Room E6-211
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 519-685-8718
Fax: 519-685-8294

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 21 Nov 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BH CHIN-YEE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chin-Yee (CPSO#: 112872 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
519-685-8500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN HULL CHIN-YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIN-YEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN HULL CHIN-YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIN-YEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017