THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:10:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7053279156
Fax: 7053254829
Address: 1000 Depalma Drive
Northumberland Hills Hospital
Department of Medicine
Intensive Care Unit
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 372-6811
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 23 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JASON T. BAU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bau (CPSO#: 112876 )
Business Address: 170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Address: 1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7053279156
Fax: 7053254829
Address: 1000 Depalma Drive
Northumberland Hills Hospital
Department of Medicine
Intensive Care Unit
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 372-6811
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 23 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JASON T. BAU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bau (CPSO#: 112876 )
Business Address: 170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Address: 1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON THEODORE BAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON THEODORE BAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Aug 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017