THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:12:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Stokes Street
Bell Gateway Bldg
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jan 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 21 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Chang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chang (CPSO#: 112936 )

Corporation Name: P. Chang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Feb 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Stokes Street
Bell Gateway Bldg
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jan 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 21 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Chang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chang (CPSO#: 112936 )

Corporation Name: P. Chang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Feb 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PO-YEN CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PO-YEN CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Jan 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017