THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:33:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Rajshahi Medical College, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 143-144-3227 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough ON M1J 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 261 4446
Fax: (416) 261 4447

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Laila Afroz Medicine Professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Afroz (CPSO#: 112955 )

Corporation Name: Dr. Laila Afroz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Nov 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI
Medical School: Rajshahi Medical College, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 143-144-3227 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough ON M1J 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 261 4446
Fax: (416) 261 4447

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Laila Afroz Medicine Professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Afroz (CPSO#: 112955 )

Corporation Name: Dr. Laila Afroz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Nov 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAILA AFROZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AFROZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAILA AFROZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AFROZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Rajshahi Medical College, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Feb 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017