THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:19:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Howard University, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bowmanville Health Centre
Suite 2200, West Wing, Second Floor
222 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 697 3607
Fax: 905 697 3645
Address: Central East Correctional Centre
541 Hwy 36
Lindsay Ontario K9V4S6
Phone: 7053286000
Extension: 2819
Fax: 7053286003
Address: 600 Oshawa Blvd N
Hillsdale Terraces
Oshawa ON L1G 5T9
Phone: 905-579-3313
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hillsdale Estates
590 Oshawa Boulevard North
Oshawa Ontario L1G 5T9
Phone: 905 579 1777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Bernard Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Thomas (CPSO#: 112960 )
Business Address: 222 King Street East
Suite 2200
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Howard University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bowmanville Health Centre
Suite 2200, West Wing, Second Floor
222 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 697 3607
Fax: 905 697 3645
Address: Central East Correctional Centre
541 Hwy 36
Lindsay Ontario K9V4S6
Phone: 7053286000
Extension: 2819
Fax: 7053286003
Address: 600 Oshawa Blvd N
Hillsdale Terraces
Oshawa ON L1G 5T9
Phone: 905-579-3313
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hillsdale Estates
590 Oshawa Boulevard North
Oshawa Ontario L1G 5T9
Phone: 905 579 1777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Bernard Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Thomas (CPSO#: 112960 )
Business Address: 222 King Street East
Suite 2200
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW BERNARD THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW BERNARD THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Howard University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017