THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:48:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi St
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Venus Valbuena Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Valbuena (CPSO#: 112996 )
Business Address: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Business Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi St
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Venus Valbuena Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Valbuena (CPSO#: 112996 )
Business Address: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Business Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VENUS CHARISSE SUGUITAN VALBUENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VALBUENA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VENUS CHARISSE SUGUITAN VALBUENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VALBUENA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017