THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:31:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad La Salle Escuela, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Department Anesthesia and
Perioperative Medicine
C3-127 - 339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 29 Apr 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 29 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Espinosa Tadeo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Espinosa Tadeo (CPSO#: 113005 )
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 26 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad La Salle Escuela, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Department Anesthesia and
Perioperative Medicine
C3-127 - 339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 29 Apr 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 29 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Espinosa Tadeo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Espinosa Tadeo (CPSO#: 113005 )
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 26 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
16 May 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 16 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ALDO ERNESTO ESPINOSA TADEO may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ALDO ERNESTO ESPINOSA TADEO may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad La Salle Escuela, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 May 2024
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 May 2024

DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017