THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:44:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 601-340 College Street
Kensington Screening Clinic
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 928-9511
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Fletcher Cres
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Alliston ON L9R 1M1
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Rolling Hills Dr
Orangeville ON L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 365 West St
Norfolk General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Simcoe ON N3Y 1T7
Phone: (519) 426-0130
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 123 Edward St
Provis-Rudd Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 400
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
Phone: (416)854-9486
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site
LOCATION: Port Perry

HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. SELLAMI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sellami (CPSO#: 113038 )
Business Address: 451 Paxton St
Port Perry ON L9L 1L9
Business Address: 400-123 Edward St
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
Business Address: 340 College Street
Kensington Screening Clinic
Elgin Illinois 60120
4169289511

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 601-340 College Street
Kensington Screening Clinic
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 928-9511
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Fletcher Cres
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Alliston ON L9R 1M1
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Rolling Hills Dr
Orangeville ON L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 365 West St
Norfolk General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Simcoe ON N3Y 1T7
Phone: (519) 426-0130
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 123 Edward St
Provis-Rudd Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 400
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
Phone: (416)854-9486
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site
LOCATION: Port Perry

HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. SELLAMI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sellami (CPSO#: 113038 )
Business Address: 451 Paxton St
Port Perry ON L9L 1L9
Business Address: 400-123 Edward St
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
Business Address: 340 College Street
Kensington Screening Clinic
Elgin Illinois 60120
4169289511

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYMEN SELLAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELLAMI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYMEN SELLAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELLAMI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Apr 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017