THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:01:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1960 Appleby Line
Suite 22, 23 & 24
Burlington Ontario L7L 0B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-315-8802
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Health Sciences - Regional Rehabilitation Centre
300 Wellington St N
Hamilton ON L8L 0A4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 300 Wellington St N
Regional Rehab Center - Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton ON L8L 0A4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 29 Aug 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 29 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1960 Appleby Line
Suite 22, 23 & 24
Burlington Ontario L7L 0B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-315-8802
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Health Sciences - Regional Rehabilitation Centre
300 Wellington St N
Hamilton ON L8L 0A4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 300 Wellington St N
Regional Rehab Center - Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton ON L8L 0A4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 29 Aug 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 29 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
30 Aug 2024
28 Aug 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 30 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Aug 28 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ALI FATEH may practise physical medicine and rehabilitation at Burlington Pain Care in Burlington, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires on August 28, 2025, or when Dr. FATEH’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. FATEH’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. FATEH’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 29 August, 2022, and will expire on or before 28 August, 2025, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ALI FATEH may practise physical medicine and rehabilitation at Burlington Pain Care in Burlington, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires on August 28, 2025, or when Dr. FATEH’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. FATEH’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. FATEH’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 29 August, 2022, and will expire on or before 28 August, 2025, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Aug 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 28 Aug 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017